Global Patent Index - EP 1125654 A3

EP 1125654 A3 2001-12-12 - Mechanical tube expander

Title (en)

Mechanical tube expander

Title (de)

Mechanischer Rohrexpander

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'évasement de tuyau mécanique

Publication

EP 1125654 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01250010 A

Priority

DE 10008688 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10008688C1] The mechanical pipe expander is a multi-edged pyramid with segments on the mantle surfaces, which are moved radially by an axial movement of the pyramid in relation to them. A lubricant cladding (5) is between the mantle surfaces of the pyramid (2) and the segments (3). The lubricant cladding (5) is a compound carbon fiber material with a polymer matrix containing graphite powder.

[origin: DE10008688C1] The mechanical pipe expander is a multi-edged pyramid with segments on the mantle surfaces, which are moved radially by an axial movement of the pyramid in relation to them. A lubricant cladding (5) is between the mantle surfaces of the pyramid (2) and the segments (3). The lubricant cladding (5) is a compound carbon fiber material with a polymer matrix containing graphite powder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 3/14 (2006.01); B21D 39/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10008688 C1 20010208; EP 1125654 A2 20010822; EP 1125654 A3 20011212; JP 2001259763 A 20010925; US 2001020381 A1 20010913

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-04 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040324

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020222

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI