Global Patent Index - EP 1125875 A3

EP 1125875 A3 2003-06-25 - Arrangement of star wheels for flat exemplars

Title (en)

Arrangement of star wheels for flat exemplars

Title (de)

Schaufelradanordnung für flächige Exemplare

Title (fr)

Arrangement de roues à aubes pour exemplaires plats

Publication

EP 1125875 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01102140 A

Priority

  • DE 10007548 A
  • FR 0008973 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JP2001247243A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To adapt the geometry of an impeller pocket for storing a flat printed book of different pages and basis weight to the condition of the printed book to be delivered each. SOLUTION: An impeller delivery for flat printed 3 outputs the printed 3 to a belt top surface 27 of a paper book output belt 9. The impeller delivery 1 has at least one impeller 5, which comprises two relatively adjustable impeller plates 10 and 11 and is characterized in changing a first pocket width 16 of impeller pockets 15 of the impeller 5.1, 5.2, 5.3 to into a second pocket width 32 thereof by advancing a sickle shaped area 33 with the relative motion of the impeller plates 10 and 11.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/6609 (2013.01); B65H 29/40 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44732 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44765 (2013.01); B65H 2402/5156 (2013.01); B65H 2511/13 (2013.01); B65H 2515/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2301/44732 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2301/44765 + B65H 2220/02
  3. B65H 2511/13 + B65H 2220/01 + B65H 2220/04
  4. B65H 2515/10 + B65H 2220/01 + B65H 2220/04

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1125875 A2 20010822; EP 1125875 A3 20030625; EP 1125875 B1 20040707; JP 2001247243 A 20010911; US 2001020768 A1 20010913; US 6494448 B2 20021217

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-12-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50102774

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110309

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-21 [REG FR ERR] CORRECTION

- Free text: BOPI DE PUBLICATION Nø: 05/26 PAGES: 273 PARTIE DU BULLETIN CONCERNEE: BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N'A PAS ETE REMISE A I'INPI IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE DE LA TRADUCTION EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI.

2005-10-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-01-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GOSS INTERNATIONAL MONTATAIRE S.A.

2005-01-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-12-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-11-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HEIDELBERG WEB SYSTEMS, S.A.

2004-10-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50102774 P 20040812

2004-08-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2004-07-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030602

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI