Global Patent Index - EP 1125876 A3

EP 1125876 A3 2002-11-06 - Apparatus for cutting and placing self-adhesive tape

Title (en)

Apparatus for cutting and placing self-adhesive tape

Title (de)

Apparat zum Schneiden und zum Anbringen eines Klebebandes

Title (fr)

Appareil pour la découpe et le positionnement d'une bande adhésive

Publication

EP 1125876 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01200293 A

Priority

NL 1014188 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1125876A2] Apparatus for cutting and for simultaneously placing two lengths of tape onto an object, like a sealing tape and a teartape on a flap of an envelope. To that end the object is guided between a transfer roll and a feed belt, with the transfer roll feeding a piece of sealing tape and a piece of teartape towards the object. The pieces of tape are cut off by two supply rolls and two knife rolls, as soon as an object approaches the transfer roll. For that purpose a sensor is mounted near the feed belt, which steers two individual servomotors for the supply rolls and two individual motors for the knife rolls. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 35/00; B31B 19/72; B65B 61/18; B65H 35/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/00 (2006.01); B65H 35/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/0013 (2013.01); B65H 35/08 (2013.01); B65H 2301/23 (2013.01); B65H 2511/51 (2013.01); B65H 2513/40 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/51 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2513/40 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/11

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1125876 A2 20010822; EP 1125876 A3 20021106; NL 1014188 C1 20010727

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030801

2004-01-07 [32PN] PUBLIC NOTIFICATION UNDER RULE 80 EPC

- Free text: NOTING OF LOSS OF RIGHTS (R.69(1)EPC)(EPO FORM 2524 DATED 08.10.03)

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20010126

- Countries: MK

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20010126

- Countries: SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK PAYMENT 20010126;RO;SI PAYMENT 20010126

2002-10-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 35/00 A, 7B 65H 35/08 B, 7B 65B 61/18 B, 7B 31B 19/72 B

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK PAYMENT 20010126;RO;SI PAYMENT 20010126