Global Patent Index - EP 1126019 B1

EP 1126019 B1 2003-06-04 - Use of an aqueous multiphase cleaning agent for cleaning hard surfaces

Title (en)

Use of an aqueous multiphase cleaning agent for cleaning hard surfaces

Title (de)

Verwendung eines wässrigen mehrphasigen Reinigungsmittels zur Reinigung harter Oferflächen

Title (fr)

Utilisation d' une composition aqueuse multiphasique pour nettoyage des surfaces dures

Publication

EP 1126019 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01103811 A

Priority

  • DE 19811386 A
  • DE 19859774 A
  • EP 99911758 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1126019A1] Aqueous liquid multiphase detergent containing surfactant has at least 2 continuous phases, including a lower aqueous phase (I) and an immiscible upper aqueous phase (II), which can be converted to an emulsion temporarily by shaking. The novelty is that the detergent contains 0-5 wt.% sodium hexametaphosphate. An independent claim is also included for the production of the detergent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 1/83; C11D 1/86; C11D 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/08 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 1/86 (2006.01); C11D 3/06 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0017 (2013.01); C11D 3/06 (2013.01); C11D 3/2086 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1126019 A1 20010822; EP 1126019 B1 20030604; AT 240387 T 20030515; AT 242313 T 20030615; CA 2324075 A1 19990923; EP 1064349 A2 20010103; EP 1064349 B1 20030514; ES 2200511 T3 20040301; ES 2200994 T3 20040316; JP 2002506925 A 20020305; US 6440924 B1 20020827; WO 9947635 A2 19990923; WO 9947635 A3 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-10-05 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-10-05 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20050407

2005-05-10 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2005-04-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050406

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050309

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-09 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20040303

2005-03-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050304

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050303

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2004-04-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200994 T3

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905877 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1064349 P

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF AN AQUEOUS MULTIPHASE CLEANING AGENT FOR CLEANING HARD SURFACES

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011126

2001-10-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JESCHKE, RAINER

2001-10-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KATOWICZ, RYSZARD

2001-10-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MEINE, GEORG

2001-10-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DITZE, ALEXANDER

2001-10-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BENOIT, MARC

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-08-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1064349

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL