EP 1126040 A1 20010822 - Use of a AlSiCuMg alloy for manufacturing a metal member interacting through a sliding surface with a friction member for a drive assembly, in particular for an internal combustion engine
Title (en)
Use of a AlSiCuMg alloy for manufacturing a metal member interacting through a sliding surface with a friction member for a drive assembly, in particular for an internal combustion engine
Title (de)
Verwendung einer AlSiCuMg Legierung zur Herstellung eines mit einem Reibpartner über eine Gleitfläche zusammenwirkenden Metall-Bauteiles für ein Antriebsaggregat, insbesondere Brennkraftmaschine
Title (fr)
Utilisation d'un alliage AlSiCuMg pour la fabrication d'une structure métallique cooperante par une surface de glissement avec une pièce de friction pour un dispositif d'entraînement, en particulier pour un moteur à combustion interne
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 10006269 A 20000212
Abstract (en)
[origin: US2001015014A1] A method of producing a metal component interacting by way of a sliding surface with a friction partner, for a drive assembly, includes forming the component from an aluminum-silicon-copper-magnesium alloy. The alloy has 12-15 wt. % silicon, 2.5-3.5 wt. % copper, and 0.4-0.8 wt. % magnesium. The particle size for the silicon is between 4 mum and 30 mum. The sliding surface of the component in the firm condition is compressed by calibrating.
Abstract (de)
Für ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines mit einem Reibpartner über eine Gleitfläche zusammenwirkenden Metall-Bauteiles aus einer Aluminium-Silizium-Legierung für ein Antriebsaggregat, insbesondere Brennkraftmaschine wird die Verwendung einer Aluminium-Silizium-Kupfer-Magnesium-Legierung vorgeschlagen mit jeweils einem gewichtsbezogenen Legierungsanteil für Silizium Si von 12 - 15 %, für Kupfer Cu von 2,5 % - 3,5 % und Magnesium Mg von 0,4 % - 0,8 %, wobei die Partikelgröße für Silizium zwischen 4 µ und 30 µm beträgt und die Gleitfläche des Bauteiles im festen Zustand mittels Kalibrieren verdichtet wird.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
C22C 1/04 (2006.01); C22C 21/02 (2006.01); C22C 21/06 (2006.01); C22C 21/08 (2006.01); F01C 21/00 (2006.01); F01C 21/08 (2006.01); F01C 21/10 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
C22C 1/0416 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 21/06 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 21/08 (2013.01 - EP US); F01C 21/08 (2013.01 - EP US); F01C 21/10 (2013.01 - EP US); B22F 2003/166 (2013.01 - EP US); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01 - EP US); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01 - EP US); F05C 2201/903 (2013.01 - EP US); Y10T 29/49462 (2015.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 4934442 A 19900619 - FUTAMURA KENICHIRO [JP], et al
- [X] US 4077810 A 19780307 - OHUCHI YASUSHI, et al
- [Y] GB 1109084 A 19680410 - REYNOLDS METALS CO
- [A] EP 0466120 A1 19920115 - SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]
- [A] EP 0669404 A2 19950830 - HITACHI POWDERED METALS [JP], et al
- [A] DE 19523484 A1 19970102 - DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]
- [A] EP 0672760 A1 19950920 - NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO [JP], et al
- [A] US 5355930 A 19941018 - DONAHUE RAYMOND J [US], et al & ADV. POWDER METALL. PART. MATER. (1996), (VOL. 4), 14/3-14/13
- [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 130, no. 26, 28 June 1999, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 355443, ISHIJIMA, Z. ET AL: "Development of P/M forged Al-Si alloy for connecting rod" XP002168395
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 080 (C - 0689) 15 February 1990 (1990-02-15)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 13 30 November 1999 (1999-11-30)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE ES FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1126040 A1 20010822; EP 1126040 B1 20041006; DE 10006269 A1 20010816; DE 50008102 D1 20041111; ES 2225004 T3 20050316; US 2001015014 A1 20010823; US 6418901 B2 20020716
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 00126815 A 20001207; DE 10006269 A 20000212; DE 50008102 T 20001207; ES 00126815 T 20001207; US 75685901 A 20010110