Global Patent Index - EP 1126058 A3

EP 1126058 A3 2002-11-27 - Device for driving rotating components in an open-end spinning machine

Title (en)

Device for driving rotating components in an open-end spinning machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Antreiben rotierbarer Organe einer OE-Spinnmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement d'organes tournant dans une machine à filer à bout libre

Publication

EP 1126058 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00108205 A

Priority

  • EP 00108205 A
  • EP 00103190 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1126058A2] The drive (2) for a rotating component (7), at an open-end spinning station, is a single motor drive system (2). The single motor drive is a step motor (2), to power a friction roller (3) which bears against the bobbin (7) to rotate it by friction contact directly or indirectly. Or the rotating component is a yarn take-off roller, between the spinner and the bobbin winder, with a single drive for a group of take-off rollers which covers only a small part of the workstations of the spinning machine. At the bobbin drive, with a friction roller (3), the acceleration phase on splicing increases the pressure between the friction roller (3) and the bobbin (7). The friction roller (3) has a surface character and/or structure to give the maximum force transfer to the bobbin. The diameter of the friction roller (3) is set so that, for the single motor drive system (2), an optimum combination is achieved of rotary speed and torque. When the wound bobbin (7) has reached the required diameter or the required yarn length has been wound, the bobbin (7) is braked by the motor drive (2). The single motor drive (2) has a selected direction of rotation. The rotary speed of the bobbin (7) is set according to the yarn tension. The yarn tension is registered according to the actual position of the yarn laying lever (5). The bobbin (7) rotary speed is controlled by the level of power fed to the drive motor or by an electronic control (6). A sensor (9) monitors the rotary speed of the bobbin (7) and/or its diameter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/48; B65H 54/46; B65H 54/52; B65H 59/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/28 (2006.01); B65H 54/34 (2006.01); B65H 54/42 (2006.01); B65H 54/74 (2006.01); B65H 59/24 (2006.01); D01H 4/42 (2006.01); D01H 4/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/48 (2013.01); B65H 54/2827 (2013.01); B65H 54/2887 (2013.01); B65H 54/42 (2013.01); B65H 54/74 (2013.01); B65H 59/005 (2013.01); B65H 59/24 (2013.01); D01H 4/42 (2013.01); B65H 2515/12 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2515/12 + B65H 2220/02

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1126058 A2 20010822; EP 1126058 A3 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-09-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 01H 4/48 A, 7B 65H 54/52 B, 7B 65H 54/46 B, 7B 65H 59/38 B

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI