Global Patent Index - EP 1126064 A3

EP 1126064 A3 2002-09-04 - Device for hydraulically needling a fibrous web by projecting a fluid

Title (en)

Device for hydraulically needling a fibrous web by projecting a fluid

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum hydrodynamischen Beaufschlagen der Fasern einer Faserbahn mit einem Fluid

Title (fr)

Dispostif de liage hydrodynamique d'une nappe fibreuse par projection d'un fluide

Publication

EP 1126064 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01103216 A

Priority

DE 10006763 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10006763A1] A continuous fiber layer (8) is compressed between converging conveying bands (3, 9) that are guided over rollers (4, 5, 6, 10, 11, 12). The fibers are then consolidated by water jets from a jetting beam (2), water being removed by a suction box (2') below. A second jetting treatment can then be performed by a further beam (16) on the lower conveying band (3). An independent claim is also included for a similar process using additional support rollers to guide the conveying bands in order to exert greater pressure on the fiber layer between the bands. Preferred Features: The wrap angle (alpha ) of the bands (3, 9) on the rollers is 5 to 45 [deg]. The jetting beam is arranged to be perpendicular to the conveying bands, irrespective of the roller arrangement and deflection angles used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/46; D04H 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25H 1/00 (2006.01); D04H 18/04 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 18/04 (2013.01); B25H 1/0064 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1126064 A2 20010822; EP 1126064 A3 20020904; EP 1126064 B1 20031217; DE 10006763 A1 20010816; US 2001027594 A1 20011011; US 6412155 B2 20020702

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-01 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20081217

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080310

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RIETER PERFOJET

- Effective date: 20040816

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031217

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101160 P 20040129

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLEISSNER GMBH & CO. MASCHINENFABRIK

2002-08-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FLEISSNER GMBH & CO. MASCHINENFABRIK

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI