Global Patent Index - EP 1126100 A3

EP 1126100 A3 2001-12-19 - Façade covering

Title (en)

Façade covering

Title (de)

Fassadenbekleidung

Title (fr)

Revêtement de façade

Publication

EP 1126100 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01103072 A

Priority

DE 10006568 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1126100A2] The facade cladding sections (12), preferably of metal secured to a carrier structure at the building wall, have a smooth visible surface (14). An angled mounting edge (16) is at the rear surface, towards the carrier structure, forming a limit edge (20) together with the visible surface (14) to overlap with the neighboring cladding section. They are bonded together by a durable adhesive bridge (22) so that their visible surfaces (14) are flush with each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/08; E04F 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/08 (2006.01); E04F 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/12 (2013.01); E04F 13/0803 (2013.01); E04F 13/0885 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1126100 A2 20010822; EP 1126100 A3 20011219; DE 10006568 A1 20010816

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070901

2006-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIKA HOLDING GMBH

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050214

2002-10-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIKA GMBH

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020410

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI