EP 1126136 A3 20040519 - Turbine blade with air cooled tip shroud
Title (en)
Turbine blade with air cooled tip shroud
Title (de)
Turbinenschaufel mit luftgekühltem Deckbandelement
Title (fr)
Aube de turbine avec carenage d'extremité refroidie
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 19963377 A 19991228
Abstract (en)
[origin: US2001006600A1] In an air-cooled turbine blade (10) which has a shroud-band element (11) at the blade tip, the shroud-band element (11) extending transversely to the blade longitudinal axis, hollow spaces (16, 16', 17, 17') for cooling being provided in the interior of the shroud-band element (11), which hollow spaces (16, 16', 17, 17') are connected on the inlet side to at least one cooling-air passage (18) passing through the turbine blade (10) to the blade tip and open on the outlet side into the exterior space surrounding the turbine blade (10), the hollow spaces (16, 16', 17, 17') and the shroud-band element (11) are matched to one another in shape and dimensions in order to reduce the weight of the shroud-band element (11).
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
CPC (source: EP US)
F01D 5/187 (2013.01 - EP US); F01D 5/225 (2013.01 - EP US); F05D 2240/81 (2013.01 - EP US); F05D 2250/141 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [PX] EP 1013884 A2 20000628 - ABB ALSTOM POWER CH AG [CH]
- [X] DE 19601819 A1 19960829 - BMW ROLLS ROYCE GMBH [DE]
- [X] US 3433015 A 19690318 - SNEEDEN RALPH J
- [X] EP 0927814 A1 19990707 - MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]
- [X] EP 0935052 A2 19990811 - MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]
- [DA] US 5306401 A 19940426 - FIERKENS RICHARD H J [NL], et al
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 457 (M - 1181) 20 November 1991 (1991-11-20)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 128 (M - 220) 3 June 1983 (1983-06-03)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 05 31 May 1996 (1996-05-31)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
US 2001006600 A1 20010705; US 6464460 B2 20021015; CN 1278018 C 20061004; CN 1301911 A 20010704; DE 19963377 A1 20010712; DE 50012982 D1 20060727; EP 1126136 A2 20010822; EP 1126136 A3 20040519; EP 1126136 B1 20060614
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 72572200 A 20001130; CN 00137072 A 20001228; DE 19963377 A 19991228; DE 50012982 T 20001019; EP 00810966 A 20001019