Global Patent Index - EP 1126252 A3

EP 1126252 A3 2002-09-04 - Level indicator for fuel tank

Title (en)

Level indicator for fuel tank

Title (de)

Füllstandsgeber für einen Kraftstofftank

Title (fr)

Indicateur de niveau pour réservoir de carburant

Publication

EP 1126252 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01101904 A

Priority

DE 10007381 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1126252A2] Level gauge for a vehicle fuel tank has two pivoting measurement value generators or sensors, coupled to a signal recorder, whose position on the signal recorder is determined using a moving signal generator. The first measurement value generator is connected to the moving signal generator, while the second signal value generator is connected to the signal recorder. Ideally the second signal value recorder and the measurement signal recorder are mechanically fixed to the housing of the measurement recorder. The signal recorder can be a variable resistance path of a rotating potentiometer, a Hall sensor etc., while the moving signal generator is the slider of the potentiometer or the Hall sensor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01F 23/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01F 23/36 (2006.01); G01F 23/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01F 23/36 (2013.01); G01F 23/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1126252 A2 20010822; EP 1126252 A3 20020904; EP 1126252 B1 20080402; DE 10007381 A1 20010823; DE 50113804 D1 20080515

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50113804

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110127

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110127

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110127

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100304

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100302

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090106

2009-01-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-05-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113804 P 20080515

2008-05-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080415

2008-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070605

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI