Global Patent Index - EP 1126333 A4

EP 1126333 A4 2001-12-19 - MECHANICAL TIMEPIECE WITH TIMED ANNULAR BALANCE ROTATING ANGLE CONTROL MECHANISM

Title (en)

MECHANICAL TIMEPIECE WITH TIMED ANNULAR BALANCE ROTATING ANGLE CONTROL MECHANISM

Title (de)

MECHANISCHER ZEITMESSER MIT DREHWINKELSTEUERMECHANISMUS MIT SYNCHRONISIERTER RINGUNRUH

Title (fr)

PIECE D'HORLOGERIE MECANIQUE DOTEE D'UN MECANISME DE COMMANDE DE L'ANGLE DE ROTATION DU BALANCIER ANNULAIRE REGLE

Publication

EP 1126333 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99933157 A

Priority

JP 9904077 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1126333A1] In a mechanical time piece according to the invention, a movement 400 includes a barrel complete 120, a center wheel & pinion 124, a third wheel & pinion 126, a fourth wheel & pinion 128, a balance with hairspring 140, an escape wheel & pinion 130 and a pallet fork 142. The mechanical time piece of the invention is provided with a rotational angle control mechanism constituted such that in a state in which a mainspring is completely wound up, air resistance is applied to rotation of the balance with hairspring 140 and in a state in which the mainspring is completely rewound, the air resistance is not applied to the rotation of the balance with hairspring 140. The balance rotational control mechanism includes a resist lever 436, 496 arranged to an outer peripheral portion of the balance with hairspring 140 to provide a clearance therebetween. Further, the balance rotational angle control mechanism is characterized in including a planetary gear mechanism 410 related to a barrel complete gear 120a and a ratchet wheel 116. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 17/06; G04B 17/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 17/06 (2006.01); G04B 17/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 17/06 (2013.01); G04B 17/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1126333 A1 20010822; EP 1126333 A4 20011219; CN 1328659 A 20011226; JP 3565227 B2 20040915; WO 0109686 A1 20010208

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050302

2004-07-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH LI

2001-12-19 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 04B 17/06 A, 7G 04B 17/26 B

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE