Global Patent Index - EP 1126775 A4

EP 1126775 A4 2002-11-20 - FOOD CONTAINER

Title (en)

FOOD CONTAINER

Title (de)

BEHÄLTER FÜR NAHRUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

RECIPIENT ALIMENTAIRE

Publication

EP 1126775 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00958996 A

Priority

  • KR 0000995 W
  • KR 19990018525 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0115583A1] The present invention relates to a container for accommodating food, such as ices, etc. The container is formed in the shape of a tube with an end thereof being opened, and includes a body having a space for accommodating the contents, and an open injection portion formed in the body and sealed after the container is filled with the contents. The container is characterized in that a wing portion, which is secured upon the filling of the container with the contents, is formed to protrude outwardly from a periphery of the injection portion formed in the body, in that the other side of the body opposite to the wing portion is formed with a stem which extends to narrowly taper from the body, and in that the container is made of natural rubber which can expand when the contents are filled therein and contract to its original state when the contents are consumed by a person.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47J 37/06; A47G 19/18; B65D 1/32; B65D 83/00; B65D 85/72; B65D 85/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/78 (2006.01); A47J 37/06 (2006.01); A47J 47/02 (2006.01); B65D 37/00 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01); B65D 77/10 (2006.01); B65D 83/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47J 47/02 (2013.01); B65D 75/5866 (2013.01); B65D 83/0061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0287530 A2 19881019 - PIBER GROUP SRL [IT]
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 08 30 June 1998 (1998-06-30)
  • See also references of WO 0115583A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0115583 A1 20010308; CN 1335753 A 20020213; EP 1126775 A1 20010829; EP 1126775 A4 20021120; JP 2003508317 A 20030304; KR 200169098 Y1 20000215

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021221

2002-11-20 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021008

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47J 37/06 A, 7B 65D 85/78 B, 7B 65D 85/72 B, 7B 65D 1/32 B, 7B 65D 83/00 B, 7A 47G 19/18 B

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE