EP 1127167 A4 20040714 - METHODS FOR PREVENTING CROSS-CONTAMINATION IN SOLID SUPPORT-BASED ASSAYS
Title (en)
METHODS FOR PREVENTING CROSS-CONTAMINATION IN SOLID SUPPORT-BASED ASSAYS
Title (de)
METHODE ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON KREUZKONTAMINATIONEN BEI TESTVERFAHREN DIE FESTE TRÄGER VERWENDEN
Title (fr)
PROCEDES DE PREVENTION DE LA CONTAMINATION CROISEE DANS LES DOSAGES A SUPPORT SOLIDE
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 9925653 W 19991102
- US 10685798 P 19981103
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO0026410A1] This invention provides an apparatus and methods for reducing artifacts in assays that use a solid support by reducing carryover of reagents from one assay mixture to another. Examples of assay formats for which the invention is useful include sandwich assays, including nucleic acid hybridization assays and immunoassays.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12Q 1/6834 (2018.01); G01N 33/543 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
C12Q 1/6834 (2013.01); G01N 33/54393 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] EP 0312135 A2 19890419 - FINDLEY ADHESIVES INC [US]
- [A] US 4554088 A 19851119 - WHITEHEAD ROY A [US], et al
- [X] SHEKARCHI I C ET AL: "Microsticks as solid-phase carriers for enzyme-linked immunosorbent assays.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY. UNITED STATES DEC 1982, vol. 16, no. 6, December 1982 (1982-12-01), pages 1012 - 1018, XP002279132, ISSN: 0095-1137
- [AD] NESS J VAN ET AL: "THE USE OF OLIGODEOXYNUCLEOTIDE PROBES IN CHAOTROPE-BASED HYBRIDIZATION SOLUTIONS", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, vol. 19, no. 19, 11 October 1991 (1991-10-11), pages 5143 - 5151, XP000378698, ISSN: 0305-1048
- [A] BRZOSKA J B ET AL: "SILANIZATION OF SOLID SUBSTRATES: A STEP TOWARD REPRODUCIBILITY", LANGMUIR, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 10, no. 11, 1 November 1994 (1994-11-01), pages 4367 - 4373, XP000671169, ISSN: 0743-7463
- [A] MOGHE P V ET AL: "Cytokine-stimulated chemotaxis of human neutrophils in a 3-D conjoined fibrin gel assay", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 180, no. 2, 27 March 1995 (1995-03-27), pages 193 - 211, XP004021042, ISSN: 0022-1759
- [A] SHOFFNER M A ET AL: "CHIP PCR.I. SURFACE PASSIVATION OF MICROFABRICATED SILICON-GLASS CHIPS FOR PCR", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, vol. 24, no. 2, 1996, pages 375 - 379, XP000605272, ISSN: 0305-1048
- [A] BUIJS J. ET AL: "The effect of adsorption on the antigen bindng by IgG and its F(ab')2 fragments", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES B, vol. 8, 1997, pages 239 - 249, XP002279133
- [A] SAMBROOK J. ET AL: "Molecular Cloning", 1989, COLD SPRNG HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, XP002279134
- See references of WO 0026410A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 0026410 A1 20000511; AU 1461500 A 20000522; AU 774572 B2 20040701; CA 2349635 A1 20000511; EP 1127167 A1 20010829; EP 1127167 A4 20040714
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 9925653 W 19991102; AU 1461500 A 19991102; CA 2349635 A 19991102; EP 99971466 A 19991102