Global Patent Index - EP 1127206 B1

EP 1127206 B1 2003-06-25 - LATCH MECHANISM AND LATCH ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

LATCH MECHANISM AND LATCH ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERRIEGELUNGSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

MECANISME ET ENSEMBLE DE VERROUILLAGE

Publication

EP 1127206 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99954108 A

Priority

  • GB 9903593 W
  • GB 9823700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2343217A] A latch mechanism 12 including a latching detent 44 for engagement with a relatively fixed striker 14 and moveable between first and second positions, a pawl 60 moveable between a first and second position and a control member 72 moveable between a first and second position, the pawl 60 in the first position blocking displacement of the detent 44 from its first position to latch the mechanism 12 and in the second position allowing the detent to move to its second position to release the latch from engagement with the striker, the control member 72 in the first position, allowing the pawl 60 to move between its first and second positions and in the second position placing the pawl 60 in its second position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

GB 2343217 A 20000503; GB 9823700 D0 19981223; DE 69909119 D1 20030731; DE 69909119 T2 20040513; EP 1127206 A1 20010829; EP 1127206 B1 20030625; WO 0026490 A1 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071029

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071029

2006-12-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061206

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-07-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031201

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031020

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909119 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SPURR, NIGEL

2002-09-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARVINMERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYSTEMS (UK) LTD

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE