Global Patent Index - EP 1127723 A9

EP 1127723 A9 2001-12-12 - Van-type vehicle with at least one openable side

Title (en)

Van-type vehicle with at least one openable side

Title (de)

Kleintransportfahrzeug mit mindestens einer zu öffnenden Seitenwand

Title (fr)

Véhicule de type camionnette avec au moins une paroi latérale ouvrable

Publication

EP 1127723 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 01104112 A

Priority

IT SV20000007 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1127723A2] The present invention relates to a power management system and method for a computer system. The current ACPI specification defines, amongst other states, an S3 state and an S4 state. The S3 state has the advantage that a transition to a working state S0 is relatively quick, 5 seconds, but the disadvantage that the system context cannot be recovered after a power failure. The S4 state has the disadvantage that a transition to the S2 state takes a significant period of time, between 20-40 seconds, but the advantage that the system context can be recovered from a power failure. Suitably, the present invention defines a safe S3 state in which the transition to the working state takes a relatively short period of time but the same state, upon entry into that state, also saves system context data to a non-volatile storage device to allow recovery from a power failure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60J 5/04; B60J 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1127723 A2 20010829; EP 1127723 A3 20030514; EP 1127723 A9 20011212; IT SV20000007 A1 20010827; IT SV20000007 D0 20000225

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031115

2004-03-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60J 5/04 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60J 5/10 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 62D 33/04 B

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI