Global Patent Index - EP 1127997 A3

EP 1127997 A3 2002-11-13 - Stairs for a stair tower

Title (en)

Stairs for a stair tower

Title (de)

Treppe für einen Treppenturm

Title (fr)

Escalier pour une tour d'escalier

Publication

EP 1127997 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01100477 A

Priority

DE 10007917 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1127997A2] The string (1) has an upper boom (2) and a lower boom (3), which are connected by at least one, but preferably at least three, staves (4) and posts (12,13). Each stave has at least two slits, which can reversibly receive suspension bolts for a step for the staircase. Preferably, slit plates of metal are fitted to the staves, in which the slits for the suspension bolts are stamped or pressed. Independent claims are included for a rectangular step and for a staircase comprising two strings and at least one, but preferably at least three steps.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 11/02; E04F 11/112

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/025 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1127997 A2 20010829; EP 1127997 A3 20021113; EP 1127997 B1 20060628; DE 10007917 A1 20010823; DE 50110297 D1 20060810

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070329

2007-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060808

2006-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110297 P 20060810

2006-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-06-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALTRAD PLETTAC ASSCO GMBH

2006-02-01 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20031113

2006-02-01 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20060301

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030419

2003-09-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PLETTAC AG

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI