Global Patent Index - EP 1128017 A3

EP 1128017 A3 2002-09-11 - End cap for a window sill

Title (en)

End cap for a window sill

Title (de)

Bordstück für Fensterbänke

Title (fr)

Embout pour appuis de fenêtre

Publication

EP 1128017 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00128397 A

Priority

DE 10008923 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1128017A2] The edge piece has an angle rail with a horizontal upper bar (2) forming a plaster edge and a vertical bar (4) parallel to the window reveal. A U-shaped clamp holder section is provided along the side edge of the windowsill. Spaced spring bars (10) for the windowsill edge are fitted along the closed base bar of the clamp holder section. Preferably, the edge piece is made of plastics, and the spring bars are formed at an angle to the base bar of the clamp holder section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/705 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1128017 A2 20010829; EP 1128017 A3 20020911; DE 10108671 A1 20011018; DE 10108671 B4 20090312

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI