Global Patent Index - EP 1128069 A3

EP 1128069 A3 2002-11-06 - Gas friction pump

Title (en)

Gas friction pump

Title (de)

Gasreibungspumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à effet visqueux

Publication

EP 1128069 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01102552 A

Priority

DE 10008691 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JP2001280289A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To provide a gas friction pump having a clearly higher exhaust velocity compared with ordinary structure even with the cross-sectional area of a suction flange being the same. SOLUTION: This invention is related to a gas friction pump provided on the suction opening 2 side with an additional pump step 20. The pump step has gas supply structure formed such that supply of gas is carried out in a radial direction. Gas supply in an axial direction and a radial direction is also practicable. A rotor structure part 21 of this pump unit and a rotor structure part 12 of other gas friction pump are present on the same rotor shaft 4.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 19/04; F04D 17/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/16 (2006.01); F04D 19/04 (2006.01); F04D 25/16 (2006.01); F04D 29/44 (2006.01); F04D 29/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/168 (2013.01); F04D 19/046 (2013.01); F04D 29/321 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1128069 A2 20010829; EP 1128069 A3 20021106; EP 1128069 B1 20160330; DE 10008691 A1 20010830; DE 10008691 B4 20171026; JP 2001280289 A 20011010; JP 4907774 B2 20120404; US 2001018018 A1 20010830; US 6524060 B2 20030225

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-12-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171031

2017-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-09-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170202

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-03-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-01-03 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50116543

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160330

2016-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160330

2016-08-03 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20160330

2016-05-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50116543

2016-04-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PFEIFFER VACUUM GMBH

2016-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2016-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2016-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2015-11-11 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20151012

2008-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080625

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04D 19/04 A, 7F 04D 17/16 B

2001-10-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GAS FRICTION PUMP

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI