Global Patent Index - EP 1128127 A3

EP 1128127 A3 2002-11-06 - Chasing rope light

Title (en)

Chasing rope light

Title (de)

Kettenlicht mit jagenden Lichteffekten

Title (fr)

Corde à lumière défilante

Publication

EP 1128127 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00303326 A

Priority

  • CN 00227427 U
  • CN 00227586 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1128127A2] A chasing rope light comprises a flexible plastics core tube (3), a pair of wires (5) extending substantially the length of the core tube (3), two sets (A, B) of series connected of bulbs (7) located inside the core tube (3) and connected to the wires (5) in parallel and current direction control means whereby when a current is applied to the pair of wires (5) in a first direction, one of the sets (A) of bulbs (7) is illuminated while when a current is applied to the wires (5) in the opposite direction, the other set (B) of bulbs (7) is illuminated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 10/00; F21S 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 4/00 (2006.01); F21S 10/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 10/00 (2013.01); F21S 4/26 (2016.01); F21Y 2101/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1128127 A2 20010829; EP 1128127 A3 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI