EP 1128149 A1 20010829 - Heat exchange module, more particularly for automotive vehicle
Title (en)
Heat exchange module, more particularly for automotive vehicle
Title (de)
Wärmeaustauschmodul, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeug
Title (fr)
Module d'échange de chaleur, notamment pour véhicule automobile
Publication
Application
Priority
FR 0002453 A 20000228
Abstract (en)
[origin: US6899167B2] A heat-exchange module has a main exchanger and at least one secondary exchanger, each having a body with fluid-circulation tubes, and cooling fins, the secondary exchanger being fixed onto the main exchanger. The module includes a set of fins common to the main exchanger and to at least one secondary exchanger, these fins being mounted on the tubes of the main exchanger and projecting from this exchanger, the projecting parts of the fins including cut-outs for accommodating the tubes of the secondary exchanger. Fastenings secure the secondary exchanger in the position in which its tubes are engaged in the cut-outs.
Abstract (fr)
L'invention concerne un module d'échange de chaleur, comprenant un échangeur principal (1) et au moins un échangeur secondaire (2) comportant chacun un corps muni de tubes de circulation de fluide, et comprenant en outre des ailettes de refroidissement (11), l'échangeur secondaire étant fixé sur l'échangeur principal. Le module comporte un jeu d'ailettes (11) commun à l'échangeur principal (1) et à au moins un échangeur secondaire (2), les ailettes étant montées sur les tubes de l'échangeur principal et faisant saillie de cet échangeur, les parties (12) des ailettes en saillie comportant des découpes (13) de réception des tubes de l'échangeur secondaire, et des moyens de blocage étant prévus pour bloquer l'échangeur secondaire dans la position où ses tubes sont engagés dans lesdites découpes. Application aux véhicules automobiles. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
F28F 1/10 (2006.01); F28D 1/04 (2006.01); F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28F 1/32 (2006.01); F28F 9/26 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
F28D 1/0435 (2013.01 - EP US); F28F 1/10 (2013.01 - KR); F28F 1/32 (2013.01 - EP US); F28D 2021/0084 (2013.01 - EP US); F28D 2021/0094 (2013.01 - EP US); F28F 2009/004 (2013.01 - EP US); F28F 2215/02 (2013.01 - EP US); F28F 2215/12 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [X] FR 1521637 A 19680419 - CHAUSSON USINES SA
- [A] US 3780799 A 19731225 - PASTERNAK S
- [Y] FR 2770633 A1 19990507 - VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR SA [FR]
- [Y] US 4492851 A 19850108 - CARR CHARLES R [US]
- [A] US 4369350 A 19830118 - KOBAYASHI NOBUYUKI [JP], et al
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 428 (M - 1025) 14 September 1990 (1990-09-14)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 02 26 February 1999 (1999-02-26)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 13 30 November 1999 (1999-11-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 11 29 November 1996 (1996-11-29)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1128149 A1 20010829; EP 1128149 B1 20050323; AT E291727 T1 20050415; BR 0100791 A 20010925; BR 0100791 B1 20090113; DE 60109510 D1 20050428; FR 2805605 A1 20010831; FR 2805605 B1 20020531; JP 2001263985 A 20010926; KR 20010085507 A 20010907; MX PA01002121 A 20020820; US 2001047860 A1 20011206; US 6899167 B2 20050531
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 01104627 A 20010223; AT 01104627 T 20010223; BR 0100791 A 20010223; DE 60109510 T 20010223; FR 0002453 A 20000228; JP 2001055564 A 20010228; KR 20010009170 A 20010223; MX PA01002121 A 20010227; US 79439601 A 20010228