Global Patent Index - EP 1128247 A3

EP 1128247 A3 2002-09-18 - Magnetic torquer control with thruster augmentation

Title (en)

Magnetic torquer control with thruster augmentation

Title (de)

Magnetischer Drehmomentgeber mit Schubkraftverstärkung

Title (fr)

Générateur de couple magnétique pour augmenter la poussée

Publication

EP 1128247 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01301642 A

Priority

US 51268800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1128247A2] Apparatus and a method is presented for controlling yaw and roll excursions in a spacecraft (20) having on-board components such as magnetic torquers (22,24), a roll thruster (32,34), momentum wheels (26,28,30), a wheel controller, an earth sensor, and a Digital Integrating Rate Assembly (DIRA). An observer module on the spacecraft receives inputs containing information comprising the unbiased roll error from the earth sensor, yaw momentum measured from the wheel speeds, and commanded yaw and pitch momentum output from the wheel controller, and produces therefrom output signals indicative of yaw estimate, yaw momentum estimate and torque disturbances estimate. A controller module on the spacecraft receives the output signals and combines them with inputs containing information comprising minimum yaw error and roll thrust yaw controller gain and minimum yaw error and roll thrust yaw momentum controller gain, and produces therefrom a signal for commanding the operation of the magnetic torquers to change roll momentum when within the dead band of the signal and, alternatively, for commanding the operation of both the magnetic torquers (22,24) and the roll thruster (32,34) to change roll momentum when the threshold of the dead band is exceeded. By so doing, the yaw attitude and yaw excursions are controlled. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05D 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64G 1/24 (2006.01); B64G 1/26 (2006.01); B64G 1/28 (2006.01); B64G 1/32 (2006.01); B64G 1/36 (2006.01); G05D 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05D 1/0883 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1128247 A2 20010829; EP 1128247 A3 20020918; JP 2001270499 A 20011002; US 6292722 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-03 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030212

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI