Global Patent Index - EP 1129020 B1

EP 1129020 B1 2003-06-04 - DEVICE FOR ALIGNING SHEETS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ALIGNING SHEETS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSRICHTEN VON BLÄTTERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR ALIGNER DES FEUILLES

Publication

EP 1129020 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99950769 A

Priority

  • DE 19848972 A
  • EP 9908017 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19848972A1] The invention relates to a device for aligning sheets. In said device, a fly forces the sheets against two stops which are arranged at a right angle relative to each other. According to a first embodiment of the invention, the fly can be adjusted about an axis perpendicular to the sheet plane so that the sheet is forced against both stops at the same time. According to a second embodiment of the invention, two flies are provided and enclose an angle in the range of 30 DEG to 60 DEG so that the sheets are forced against both stops. The inventive device provides a means for reliably stacking and aligning sheets of various weights, roughnesses and sizes at a high rate (>/= 80 sheets/min).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/34 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1114 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19848972 A1 20000504; DE 19848972 C2 20020829; EP 1129020 A2 20010905; EP 1129020 B1 20030604; US 6676124 B1 20040113; WO 0024659 A2 20000504; WO 0024659 A3 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091022

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081028

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905878 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010510

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE