Global Patent Index - EP 1129101 A4

EP 1129101 A4 2002-09-18 - A NOVEL G-PROTEIN COUPLED 7TM RECEPTOR (AXOR15)

Title (en)

A NOVEL G-PROTEIN COUPLED 7TM RECEPTOR (AXOR15)

Title (de)

AN DEN 7TM-REZEPTOR GEKOPPELTES G-PROTEIN

Title (fr)

NOUVEAU RECEPTEUR DE 7TM COUPLE A UNE PROTEINE G (AXOR15)

Publication

EP 1129101 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99972639 A

Priority

  • GB 9825423 A
  • US 9927328 W
  • US 24711199 A
  • US 42540699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0031104A1] AXOR15 polypeptides and polynucleotides and methods for producing such polypeptides by recombinant techniques are disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing AXOR15 polypeptides and polynucleotides in therapy, and diagnostic assays for such.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/02; A61K 48/00; A61K 49/00; C07H 21/04; C07K 14/72; C12N 5/00; C12N 5/02; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/85; C12N 15/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0031104 A1 20000602; EP 1129101 A1 20010905; EP 1129101 A4 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040420

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): GB

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031007

2002-10-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020805

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): GB

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07H 21/02 A, 7C 07H 21/04 B, 7A 61K 48/00 B, 7A 61K 49/00 B, 7C 12N 15/00 B, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7C 12N 15/86 B, 7C 12N 5/02 B, 7C 12N 15/85 B, 7C 12N 5/00 B, 7C 07K 14/72 B

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): GB

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE