Global Patent Index - EP 1129637 A3

EP 1129637 A3 2002-09-25 - Hook

Title (en)

Hook

Title (de)

Haken

Title (fr)

Crochet

Publication

EP 1129637 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01103691 A

Priority

IT PD20000015 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1129637A2] A hook or similar fastening element, comprising a composite body (11) which is constituted by a hook-shaped structural supporting frame which is coupled to an external covering (13) which is also shaped. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 13/00; A41F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43C 3/00 (2006.01); A44B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 13/0017 (2013.01); A43C 3/00 (2013.01); A44B 13/0029 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1129637 A2 20010905; EP 1129637 A3 20020925; IT 249372 Y1 20030414; IT PD20000015 U1 20010903

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 44B 13/00 A, 7A 41F 1/00 B

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI