Global Patent Index - EP 1129784 A3

EP 1129784 A3 2002-11-13 - Electrostatic painting machine selectively used in two ways and a method for the same

Title (en)

Electrostatic painting machine selectively used in two ways and a method for the same

Title (de)

Elektrostatische Beschichtigungseinrichtung mit zwei Gebrauchsweisen und Verfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Dispositif de revêtement électrostatique utilisé de deux façons et procédé correspondant

Publication

EP 1129784 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01101203 A

Priority

JP 2000017551 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1129784A2] An electrostatic painting machine is disclosed, which can selectively function in two ways of use, dedicated to the rotary atomizing painting and the aero-atomizing painting, respectively, by simply replacing a part of its components with another. An electrostatic painting machine (1) has a shared body (3), and an aero-atomizing head (5) and a rotary atomizing head (7) attachable to and detachable from the body (3). The painting machine (1) is dedicated to aero-atomizing painting when the aero-atomizing head (5) is attached to the body (3) while it is dedicated to the rotary atomizing painting when the rotary atomizing head (7) is attached to the body (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 5/03; B05B 5/04; B05B 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/025 (2006.01); B05B 5/03 (2006.01); B05B 5/04 (2006.01); B05B 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/03 (2013.01); B05B 5/04 (2013.01); B05B 5/0426 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] EP 0850693 A1 19980701 - ABB INDUSTRY K K [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1129784 A2 20010905; EP 1129784 A3 20021113; EP 1129784 B1 20031217; CN 1171684 C 20041020; CN 1319457 A 20011031; DE 60101489 D1 20040129; DE 60101489 T2 20040609; JP 2001205143 A 20010731; KR 100738570 B1 20070712; KR 20010078023 A 20010820; TW 496779 B 20020801

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070119

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040517

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-01-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050117

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040328

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60101489 P 20040129

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT PT

2003-12-17 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT PT

2003-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI