Global Patent Index - EP 1129974 A3

EP 1129974 A3 2002-11-13 - Apparatus for controlling the tension of a travelling yarn in an automatic winder

Title (en)

Apparatus for controlling the tension of a travelling yarn in an automatic winder

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Fadenzugkraft eines laufenden Fadens in einer automatischen Wickeleinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le réglage de la force de tension d'un fil en mouvement dans un bobinoir automatique

Publication

EP 1129974 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01100867 A

Priority

DE 10009611 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1129974A2] Thread tensioning pegs (14, 14', 14'') and electrical coil (18) occupy a common swinging arm (10). The coil swings in an air gap surrounding it, with a magnet arrangement producing magnetic flux. This penetrates the air gap at right angles. Preferred features: The swinging arm is double. A first arm carries the thread tensioners, a second the coil. Disposition of coil and tensioners (a series of pegs swinging with the arm) is diametral with respect to the axis of pivoting. Coil and magnets produce a torque on the arm which is proportional to the current. At least two magnets are used; especially permanent magnets.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 59/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/36 (2006.01); B65H 59/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/28 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1129974 A2 20010905; EP 1129974 A3 20021113; EP 1129974 B1 20040915; DE 10009611 A1 20010830; JP 2001240310 A 20010904; JP 5085816 B2 20121128; US 2001017331 A1 20010830; US 6511012 B2 20030128

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: LEVERKUSER STRASSE 65, 42897 REMSCHEID (DE)

2014-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER AND PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANW, CH

2014-06-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SAURER GERMANY GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAURER GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

2012-11-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50103575

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110207

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103575 P 20041021

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030513

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI