Global Patent Index - EP 1130151 B1

EP 1130151 B1 2002-11-13 - Embroidery machine, especially shuttle embroidery machine

Title (en)

Embroidery machine, especially shuttle embroidery machine

Title (de)

Stickmaschine, insbesondere Schiffchenstickmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à broder, en particulier machine à broder à navette

Publication

EP 1130151 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01810113 A

Priority

CH 3902000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1130151A1] An embroidery machine has a movable frame (11) with fabric rollers (13, 15), which are fitted with roller supports (35) spaced along their length to resist bending due to the tension in the fabric (17). Additional roller supports (43) are fitted on the opposite side of each roller (13, 15). Several of these supports (43) are distributed along the length of the rollers. They can be lifted off the rollers by means of pneumatic actuators (39), which are operated together by the machine controller when the roller has to be rotated. Preferred Features: The supports and actuators are constructed as a unit (37) mounted on the frame bracing members (33).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05C 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05C 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05C 9/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1130151 A1 20010905; EP 1130151 B1 20021113; AT 227787 T 20021115; DE 50100052 D1 20021219

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170206

2017-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 227787 T

- Effective date: 20170206

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070206

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050210

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100052 20021219

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI TR

2002-11-13 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227787 T 20021115

2002-06-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI TR

2002-06-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011126

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI