Global Patent Index - EP 1130604 A3

EP 1130604 A3 2002-11-13 - Data or control cable and method for optimizing of such a cable

Title (en)

Data or control cable and method for optimizing of such a cable

Title (de)

Daten- bzw. Steuerkabel sowie Verfahren zur Optimierung eines derartigen Kabels

Title (fr)

Câble de données ou de commande et procédé pour optimiser un tel câble

Publication

EP 1130604 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01105023 A

Priority

DE 10009809 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1130604A2] The cable has at least one forward conductor and at least one return conductor. At least one conductor (1) is asymmetrical in geometric shape relative to its cross-sectional center of mass axis. The forward and return conductors are formed mirror symmetrically relative to each other. At least one conductor has a triangular, trapezoidal, semicircular or circular segment-shaped cross-section. Independent claims are also included for the following: a method for optimizing a data or control cable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1130604 A2 20010905; EP 1130604 A3 20021113; DE 10009809 A1 20010906

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061003

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030402

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI