Global Patent Index - EP 1131529 A4

EP 1131529 A4 2003-06-11 - METHOD OF FORMING EVACUATED GLASS PANELS

Title (en)

METHOD OF FORMING EVACUATED GLASS PANELS

Title (de)

METHODE ZUM HERSTELLEN VON VAKUUMISOLIERSCHEIBEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PANNEAUX DE VERRE SOUS VIDE

Publication

EP 1131529 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99957703 A

Priority

  • AU 9900965 W
  • AU PP719298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0029704A1] A method of forming an evacuated glass panel which facilitates the placement of a pump-out tube close to one edge of the finished panel. First and second glass sheets (12 and 13) are assembled in face-to-face spaced-apart relationship, with the first sheet (12) having an edge portion (33) that extends beyond the corresponding edge portion (34) of the second sheet. A pump-out tube (18) is provided in the first sheet at a location adjacent the corresponding edge portion (34) of the second sheet. The first and second sheets (12 and 13) are sealed around their edges to form a chamber (15) which is evacuated by way of an evacuating head (10). Following the evacuation process, the pump-out tube (18) is closed and the edge portion (33) of the first sheet is trimmed so as to lie adjacent the corresponding edge portion (34) of the second sheet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/677

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03C 27/06 (2006.01); E06B 3/677 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/6612 (2013.01); E06B 3/6775 (2013.01); Y02A 30/25 (2018.01); Y02B 80/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9102878 A1 19910307 - UNIV SYDNEY [AU]
  • [A] EP 0161713 A2 19851121 - CONDENSAFE BV [NL]
  • [A] GARRISON J D ET AL: "Manufacture and cost of vacuum glazing", SOLAR ENERGY, PERGAMON PRESS. OXFORD, GB, vol. 55, no. 3, 1 September 1995 (1995-09-01), pages 151 - 161, XP004002493, ISSN: 0038-092X
  • See also references of WO 0029704A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0029704 A1 20000525; AU PP719298 A0 19981217; CA 2351818 A1 20000525; EP 1131529 A1 20010912; EP 1131529 A4 20030611; JP 2002530259 A 20020917

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050601

2003-06-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030502

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE