Global Patent Index - EP 1131561 B1

EP 1131561 B1 2003-06-25 - COMPRESSOR CASING CONFIGURATION

Title (en)

COMPRESSOR CASING CONFIGURATION

Title (de)

GEHÄUSEKONFIGURATION FÜR EINEN VERDICHTER

Title (fr)

CONFIGURATION D'UN CARTER DE COMPRESSEUR

Publication

EP 1131561 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99972292 A

Priority

  • CA 9901071 W
  • CA 2254043 A
  • US 25828699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0029751A1] A compressor (10) for a gas turbine engine, comprising a casing (26) having an inner surface defining a plurality of circumferentially spaced-apart grooves (36) adjacent the tips of a row of rotor blades (16). Each groove (36) has a depth which is less than half the width thereof in order to increase surge margin at off design points without affecting the performance of the compressor (10) under normal operating conditions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/42; F04D 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/44 (2006.01); F04D 27/02 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/4213 (2013.01); F04D 29/685 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0029751 A1 20000525; DE 69909120 D1 20030731; DE 69909120 T2 20031224; EP 1131561 A1 20010912; EP 1131561 B1 20030625; JP 2002530574 A 20020917

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-02-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909120 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMPRESSOR CASING CONFIGURATION

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010512

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE