EP 1132167 A3 20011205 - Friction stir welding
Title (en)
Friction stir welding
Title (de)
Drehendes Reibungschweissen
Title (fr)
Soudage par agitation-friction
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 2000060202 A 20000306
- JP 2000318730 A 20001019
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1132167A2] In friction stir welding in which members (70,76) to be welded progressively along a welding line (79) are fixed to a support (20) and are friction stir welded by means of a tool (50) rotating on an axis, the axis of the tool is inclined relative to the welding line such that in the direction of welding along the welding line the end portion (51) is advanced with respect to the larger diameter portion (52), and during at least part of the friction stir welding the support (20) is rotated about an axis which is inclined relative to the axis of the rotary tool. The method is especially applicable to welding a continuous path, such as a circle. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B23K 20/12 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
B23K 20/12 (2013.01 - KR); B23K 20/122 (2013.01 - EP US); B23K 20/123 (2013.01 - EP US); B23K 20/1235 (2013.01 - EP US); B23K 20/124 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] US 5697544 A 19971216 - WYKES DONALD H [US]
- [Y] EP 0893189 A2 19990127 - HITACHI LTD [JP]
- [Y] EP 0888843 A1 19990107 - SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP [JP]
- [Y] GB 2011815 A 19790718 - ZIMMERMANN H
- [Y] EP 0810055 A1 19971203 - BOEING CO [US]
- [XY] US 5971252 A 19991026 - ROSEN CHARLES D [US], et al
- [A] US 5201455 A 19930413 - REYNOLDS JR SAMUEL D [US], et al
- [XAY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 11 30 September 1999 (1999-09-30)
- [XDY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 12 29 October 1999 (1999-10-29)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 13 30 November 1999 (1999-11-30)
- [XDA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 12 29 October 1999 (1999-10-29)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 287 (M - 0988) 21 June 1990 (1990-06-21)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 14 31 December 1998 (1998-12-31)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1132167 A2 20010912; EP 1132167 A3 20011205; EP 1132167 B1 20040428; AU 1834801 A 20010913; AU 756304 B2 20030109; CN 1192846 C 20050316; CN 1301176 C 20070221; CN 1312141 A 20010912; CN 1583344 A 20050223; CN 1583345 A 20050223; DE 60102963 D1 20040603; DE 60102963 T2 20050105; EP 1293288 A1 20030319; JP 2001321966 A 20011120; JP 3575748 B2 20041013; KR 100481782 B1 20050411; KR 20010087185 A 20010915; TW 473411 B 20020121; US 2001019073 A1 20010906; US 2002079347 A1 20020627; US 2002079352 A1 20020627; US 2003205608 A1 20031106; US 6722555 B2 20040420; US 6786388 B2 20040907
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 01301335 A 20010215; AU 1834801 A 20010207; CN 01104522 A 20010215; CN 200410064484 A 20010215; CN 200410064485 A 20010215; DE 60102963 T 20010215; EP 02025240 A 20010215; JP 2000318730 A 20001019; KR 20010007427 A 20010215; TW 90102544 A 20010206; US 45539203 A 20030606; US 78128901 A 20010213; US 8509002 A 20020301; US 8509102 A 20020301