Global Patent Index - EP 1132173 A3

EP 1132173 A3 2002-09-04 - Torque transmission tool

Title (en)

Torque transmission tool

Title (de)

Werkzeug zum Übertragen eines Drehmoments

Title (fr)

Outil de transmission de couple

Publication

EP 1132173 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01104252 A

Priority

DE 10011506 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1132173A2] Tool comprises a drive part (1) for introducing torque, a drive part (2) for reducing torque and connected to the drive part (1) so that it rotates and cannot be moved axially, and a coupling (9) limiting torque, whose inlet introducing torque is connected to the drive part (1) so that it does not rotate and whose outlet reducing torque is rigidly connected to the drive part (2) so that it does not rotate. The coupling is arranged so that it is not involved in the transfer of axial forces using the tool. Preferred Features: The coupling is not connected in an axial direction to the drive part (1) or (2). The coupling is held axially against the tool so that it moves.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/14; B25B 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23P 19/06 (2006.01); B25B 23/14 (2006.01); B25B 23/142 (2006.01); B25B 23/157 (2006.01); F16D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/1427 (2013.01); B25B 23/141 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1132173 A2 20010912; EP 1132173 A3 20020904; CA 2339713 A1 20010909; DE 10011506 A1 20010913; JP 2001328076 A 20011127; TW 574089 B 20040201; US 2001025714 A1 20011004

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 25B 23/14 A, 7B 25B 13/06 B

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI