Global Patent Index - EP 1132514 B9

EP 1132514 B9 2004-12-22 - Independent servo motor controlled scroll-type pattern attachment for tufting machine and computerized design system

Title (en)

Independent servo motor controlled scroll-type pattern attachment for tufting machine and computerized design system

Title (de)

Mit unabhängigen Stellmotoren betriebene Musterherstellungsvorrichtung für Tuftingmaschinen und rechnergestütztes Entwurfsystem

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour produire des motifs commandés par des servomoteurs indépendants pour machine à tufter et système de conception assistée par ordinateur

Publication

EP 1132514 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 01111949 A

Priority

  • EP 97120835 A
  • US 3195496 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1132514A2] The present invention provides a scroll-type yarn feed attachment for tufting machines characterized by independent servo-motor control of sets of yarn feed rolls, an improved tube bank, and a software design system to facilitate use of the attachment. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05C 15/32; D05C 15/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05C 15/18 (2006.01); D05C 15/32 (2006.01); D05B 19/08 (2006.01); D05B 19/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05C 15/32 (2013.01); D05C 15/18 (2013.01); D05B 19/08 (2013.01); D05B 19/12 (2013.01); D05D 2205/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1132514 A2 20010912; EP 1132514 A3 20020306; EP 1132514 B1 20040818; EP 1132514 B9 20041222

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121127

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69730363

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121127

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110906

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69730363 P 20040923

2004-08-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0854220 P

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MORGANTE, MICHAEL R.

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STANFIELD, RANDALL E.

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BISHOP, MIKE

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-09-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 854220

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB