Global Patent Index - EP 1132526 A3

EP 1132526 A3 2002-11-20 - Manhole cover

Title (en)

Manhole cover

Title (de)

Abdeckung für eine Bodenöffnung

Title (fr)

Couvercle de regard de chaussée

Publication

EP 1132526 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01810212 A

Priority

CH 4442000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1132526A2] Cover comprises a frame (3) and a lid (1). The minimum of three first contact points of the first slanted lid plane (12) or of the first slanted frame plane (32) are elastically moved on the frame before the first assembly of the lid so that the first slanted lid plane and the first slanted frame plane are in alignment. The cover has devices (34) for fixing these elastically movable first contact points in the aligned position. An Independent claim is included for the use of the cover.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 29/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/1427 (2013.01); E02D 29/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1132526 A2 20010912; EP 1132526 A3 20021120; CH 694056 A5 20040630

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2003-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VON ROLL INFRANET SA

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030125

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI