Global Patent Index - EP 1132531 A3

EP 1132531 A3 2002-11-27 - W.C. pressure cistern with air bag and injector

Title (en)

W.C. pressure cistern with air bag and injector

Title (de)

W.C.-Druckspüler mit Luftkammer und Injektor

Title (fr)

Réservoir de chasse pressurisé de w.-c. avec cloche d'air et injecteur

Publication

EP 1132531 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01600002 A

Priority

GR 2000100051 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1132531A2] A pressure cistern for flushing a toilet, with an airbag, an injector and its own outlet valve. A pressure cistern for flushing a toilet (fig. 1), containing an airbag (2) or airbags. It fills with water through an injector (3) which also supplies the air vessel with air pumped in from the atmosphere through a non-return valve (5). The valve in figure 2 may be fitted to the cistern, or the valve in figure 3 may be fitted to the cistern's outlet pipe, so that water flows out through the valve in figure 2 or figure 3 towards the toilet bowl. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1132531 A2 20010912; EP 1132531 A3 20021127; GR 1003464 B 20001019

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-09-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI