Global Patent Index - EP 1132613 A3

EP 1132613 A3 2003-06-04 - Method for starting an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method for starting an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Starten einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode de démarrage d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1132613 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01104950 A

Priority

DE 10011507 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1132613A2] The method involves setting the fuel pressure (FUP) in a pressure reservoir to a starting value at the beginning of a starting process; starting the engine (M) with a starter revolution rate (N_Starter); determining the time in which the engine revolution rate (N) is held at the level of the starter revolution rate; and if a defined period is exceeded, increasing the pressure in the pressure reservoir until the engine indicates a defined increase in its revolution rate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 17/00; F02D 41/06; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02N 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 99/006 (2013.01); F02D 41/061 (2013.01); F02D 41/062 (2013.01); F02D 41/3827 (2013.01); F02D 41/3836 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0602 (2013.01); F02D 2250/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1132613 A2 20010912; EP 1132613 A3 20030604; EP 1132613 B1 20040519

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50102303 P 20040624

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030721

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02N 17/00 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/38 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/06 B

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI