Global Patent Index - EP 1132723 A8

EP 1132723 A8 2001-12-05 - Device for monitoring the level of a liquid in a closed container

Title (en)

Device for monitoring the level of a liquid in a closed container

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Beobachtung eines Flüssigkeitsspegels in einem geschlossenen Behälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle du niveau d'un liquide dans un récipient fermé

Publication

EP 1132723 A8 (FR)

Application

EP 01400169 A

Priority

FR 0000745 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2804207A1] The presence of a liquid (3), at a nominal level (4) in a closed container (1) may be checked by installing a periscope (8) either in the manhole lid (2) or the container body. The periscope has it's lower end adjacent to a graduated scale (5) and marker (6) and the upper end is either directly read or connected to an image transfer box (13) linked to a screen in the driver's cabin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01F 23/02; G01F 23/292

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01F 23/02 (2006.01); G01F 23/292 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01F 23/2921 (2013.01); G01F 23/02 (2013.01); G01F 23/292 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2804207 A1 20010727; FR 2804207 B1 20020503; EP 1132723 A1 20010912; EP 1132723 A8 20011205

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MERCERON

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI