Global Patent Index - EP 1132914 A3

EP 1132914 A3 2001-12-05 - Information recording medium, information recording method and information reproducing method

Title (en)

Information recording medium, information recording method and information reproducing method

Title (de)

Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium, Informationsaufzeichnungsverfahren und Informationswiedergabesverfahren

Title (fr)

Support d'enregistrement d'information, méthode d'enregistrement et de reproduction d'information

Publication

EP 1132914 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01105672 A

Priority

JP 2000062841 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1132914A2] An information recording medium comprises a user area, and a spare area including a replacement area, wherein the replacement area may be used instead of a defective area in the user area. The user area and the spare area include a plurality of sectors. Each of the plurality of sectors includes a user data area for recording user data, and an attribute data area for recording defect replacement allowance attribute data. The defect replacement allowance attribute data indicates whether recording of the user data has been executed in a state that the execution of a defect replacement process is allowed. In the defect replacement process, the defective area in the user area is replaced with the replacement area in the spare area. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 20/12; G11B 20/00; G11B 20/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 20/00 (2006.01); G11B 20/12 (2006.01); G11B 20/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 20/1883 (2013.01); G11B 20/00086 (2013.01); G11B 20/1254 (2013.01); G11B 2220/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1132914 A2 20010912; EP 1132914 A3 20011205; EP 1132914 B1 20140430; BR 0109255 A 20030429; CN 1231912 C 20051214; CN 1416572 A 20030507; US 2001026511 A1 20011004; US 2004174785 A1 20040909; US 7027373 B2 20060411; US 7072256 B2 20060704; WO 0167449 A2 20010913; WO 0167449 A3 20020207; ZA 200207055 B 20030530

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20150202

2014-04-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2014-04-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2014-01-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140108

2009-07-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090610

2008-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION

2002-10-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011217

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI