Global Patent Index - EP 1132935 A3

EP 1132935 A3 2003-06-04 - Electrical component and process for the manufacture thereof

Title (en)

Electrical component and process for the manufacture thereof

Title (de)

Elektrisches Bauelement und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Composant électrique et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1132935 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01105565 A

Priority

  • EP 01105565 A
  • EP 00104952 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1132935A2] The invention relates to an electrical component having a functional unit (2) which is secured to a header (1) and which generates or is sensitive to sound, and having terminal elements (3) which are mechanically secured to the header (1) and electrically and acoustically coupled to the functional unit (2) and which project through holes in the header (1) onto the side of the header (1) remote from the functional unit (2) and which have a modulus of elasticity of EA > 50 MPa, in which the terminal elements are partially encased in a viskoelastic material (4) having a modulus of elasticity of Ew < 10 MPa. By encasing the terminal elements (3) in a viskoelastic material (4), effective sound-damping can be produced. Furthermore, the invention relates to a process for manufacturing the component. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/44; G10K 11/16; H01H 50/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/30 (2006.01); H01H 50/44 (2006.01); H01H 3/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/443 (2013.01); H01H 50/305 (2013.01); H01H 3/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1132935 A2 20010912; EP 1132935 A3 20030604; EP 1132935 B1 20060823

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: TE CONNECTIVITY GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 337611 T

- Effective date: 20160321

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: TE CONNECTIVITY GERMANY GMBH

- Effective date: 20151027

2015-07-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TE CONNECTIVITY GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP GMBH, 64625 BENSHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 60122407

2015-03-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070524

2007-03-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60122407 P 20061005

2006-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2006-08-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-08-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060823

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI