Global Patent Index - EP 1133211 A3

EP 1133211 A3 2002-12-04 - Information apparatus having speakers

Title (en)

Information apparatus having speakers

Title (de)

Informationsvorrichtung mit Lautsprecher

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'information avec haut-parleur

Publication

EP 1133211 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01301842 A

Priority

JP 2000060209 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1133211A2] In an information apparatus having speakers, an inspection signal of the frequency out of the audible frequency band outputted from the microcomputer 23 is inputted into the input terminal 14a of power IC 10a via the input switch circuit 22, a signal to be inspected, which is outputted to the ripple terminal 13a of power IC 10a according to the inspection signal, is extracted by the extracting circuit 20a, and it is judged by an intensity of the output signal outputted from the extracting circuit 20a whether or not speaker FLS is connected to the amplifier 12a. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2006.01); H04R 5/04 (2006.01); H04R 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 5/04 (2013.01); H04R 2420/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1133211 A2 20010912; EP 1133211 A3 20021204; EP 1133211 B1 20070801; DE 60129623 D1 20070913; DE 60129623 T2 20071206; JP 2001251700 A 20010914; JP 3908434 B2 20070425

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080506

2007-12-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60129623 P 20070913

2007-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-08-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030516

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI