Global Patent Index - EP 1133545 B1

EP 1133545 B1 2002-09-04 - ALL PURPOSE CLEANER WITH DIQUATERNARY POLYSILOXANE

Title (en)

ALL PURPOSE CLEANER WITH DIQUATERNARY POLYSILOXANE

Title (de)

ALLZWECKREINIGER MIT DIQUATERNÄREM POLYSILOXAN

Title (fr)

NETTOYANT TOUS USAGES CONTENANT UN POLYSILOXANE DIQUATERNAIRE

Publication

EP 1133545 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99957296 A

Priority

  • DE 19853720 A
  • EP 9908650 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19853720A1] Aqueous cleaners for hard surfaces, which contain surfactant and diquaternary polysiloxane (I), contain >= 1 wt.% anionic surfactant with respect to total surfactant and (I). Independent claims are also included for: (a) the use of (I) in the liquid cleaner for shortening the drying time of the treated surface; (b) a method of shortening the drying time of the treated surface by treatment with the cleaner in concentrated or diluted form.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37; C11D 1/00; C11D 1/83; C11D 1/94

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/02 (2006.01); C11D 1/82 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 1/008 (2013.01); C11D 1/02 (2013.01); C11D 3/3742 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19853720 A1 20000525; EP 1133545 A1 20010919; EP 1133545 B1 20020904; WO 0031224 A1 20000602

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20140411

2014-04-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140320 AND 20140326

2013-12-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: EVONIK GOLDSCHMIDT GMBH, 45127 ESSEN, DE

- Document: DE 59902598

- Effective date: 20131024

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-06-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GOLDSCHMIDT G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-03-17 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20100223

2010-03-17 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20100223

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-01 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-11-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-11-04 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-05-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1133545E

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021126

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902598 20021010

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020129

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE