Global Patent Index - EP 1133621 B1

EP 1133621 B1 2002-09-18 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTUATING DRIVE FOR A GAS EXCHANGE VALVE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTUATING DRIVE FOR A GAS EXCHANGE VALVE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINES ELEKTROMECHANISCHEN STELLANTRIEBS FÜR EIN GASWECHSELVENTIL EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN MECANISME DE COMMANDE ELECTROMECANIQUE DESTINE A UNE SOUPAPE D'ECHANGE GAZEUX D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1133621 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99964376 A

Priority

  • DE 9903731 W
  • DE 19854627 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0031384A1] An assessed value (FG,AV,0) of an interfering force resulting from the gas forces which influence the gas exchange valve immediately before it opens is calculated. The time history (FG,AV,t) of the interfering force, which is produced on the gas exchange valve after it has begun to open, is assessed based on the step response of a transmission member to a step change of the interfering force from the assessed value (FG,AV,0) to a predetermined value. An actuating signal for the actuating drive is determined in dependence on the time history of the interfering force.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/00 (2006.01); F01L 9/04 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/145 (2013.01); F01L 9/04 (2013.01); F01L 2201/00 (2013.01); F02D 2200/703 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0031384 A1 20000602; EP 1133621 A1 20010919; EP 1133621 B1 20020918; JP 2002530582 A 20020917; US 2001054400 A1 20011227; US 6371064 B2 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051124

2004-11-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041117

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041109

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1133621E

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902798 20021024

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020305

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010504

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE