Global Patent Index - EP 1133637 B1

EP 1133637 B1 2002-09-25 - FUEL SUPPLY DEVICE FOR A DIRECT INJECTION INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

FUEL SUPPLY DEVICE FOR A DIRECT INJECTION INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFZUFUHREINRICHTUNG EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT DIREKTER EINSPRITZUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN CARBURANT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE, A INJECTION DIRECTE

Publication

EP 1133637 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99960995 A

Priority

  • EP 9909075 W
  • FR 9814975 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2786534A1] The invention concerns a device comprising a) a fuel tank (1); b) first pumping means (2, 3) for pumping the fuel contained in the tank (1), delivering fuel brought to a first pressure level higher than atmospheric pressure; c) second pumping means (5, 8) supplied by the first means (2, 3) and delivering fuel brought to a second pressure level, higher that the first, to fuel injectors (6i) in the engine cylinders; and d) means for recirculating the excess fuel not injected into the engine. The invention is characterised in that the recirculating means comprise a conduit (15) through which the excess fuel and the fuel delivered by the first pumping means simultaneously circulate, a pressure regulator (3) forming part of the first pumping means (2, 3) being provided downstream of the conduit (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 63/02; F02M 55/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01); F02M 69/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02M 55/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2786534 A1 20000602; FR 2786534 B1 20001229; DE 69903191 D1 20021031; DE 69903191 T2 20030213; EP 1133637 A1 20010919; EP 1133637 B1 20020925; JP 2002531753 A 20020924; WO 0032929 A1 20000608

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071122

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071122

2007-01-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061109

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1133637E

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903191 20021031

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE S.A.S.

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010322

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE