Global Patent Index - EP 1133945 A3

EP 1133945 A3 2003-06-18 - Shower tray

Title (en)

Shower tray

Title (de)

Duschtasse

Title (fr)

Bac à douche

Publication

EP 1133945 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00310982 A

Priority

GB 0004257 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2359484A] A shower tray 10 in combination with a trap 13, the trap 13 comprising a sump 14 which is formed integrally with the shower tray 10, a shower water inlet 16 through which water from the tray 10 can enter the sump 14, a waste water outlet 19, and a partitioning element 22 preventing communication between the shower water inlet 16 and the waste water outlet 19 except at a level below both the inlet 16 and the outlet 19.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/40; E03C 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/40 (2006.01); E03C 1/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/29 (2013.01); A47K 3/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

GB 0004257 D0 20000412; GB 2359484 A 20010829; GB 2359484 B 20031119; EP 1133945 A2 20010919; EP 1133945 A3 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040611

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DLP LIMITED

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI