Global Patent Index - EP 1134181 A3

EP 1134181 A3 2003-06-25 - Rotation device for working units in lift trucks or the like

Title (en)

Rotation device for working units in lift trucks or the like

Title (de)

Drehvorrichtung für Arbeitsgeräte in Hubwagen oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de rotation des unités de travail dans des chariots élévateurs ou analogues

Publication

EP 1134181 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01106014 A

Priority

IT VR20000012 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1134181A2] The present device is provided with conceptually new means which allow an angular displacement of the fork-carrying or tool-carrying plate, which means are very advantageous in comparison with the known solutions as the conventional system of rotation on ball bearings is no more necessary. In general, such means comprise a device of rotation (1) which is obtained in a fixed element or casing (2) on the rear side of which there are fixing clamps (2') which are to be coupled with corresponding front clamps (3) which are fixed to the self-moving lift truck. The fixed element or casing (2) is provided with a hollow seat in which a crown (4) is inserted. The crown (4) represents the rotating part on which an outer fork-carrying unit is mounted. A supporting plate (5) is included in the fork-carrying unit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/08 (2006.01); B66F 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/082 (2013.01); B66F 9/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1134181 A2 20010919; EP 1134181 A3 20030625; IT 251020 Y1 20031104; IT VR20000012 U1 20010914

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080911

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061106

2004-03-24 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031229

- Countries: AL

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031229

- Countries: LT

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031229

- Countries: LV

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031229

- Countries: MK

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031229

- Countries: RO

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031229

- Countries: SI

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI