Global Patent Index - EP 1134331 A3

EP 1134331 A3 2003-06-04 - Set of elements for a scaffold

Title (en)

Set of elements for a scaffold

Title (de)

Bauelementsatz für ein Gerüst

Title (fr)

Ensemble d'éléments pour un coffrage

Publication

EP 1134331 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01105008 A

Priority

DE 20004389 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1134331A2] A safety rail fitting for a scaffold frame has the rail (9) secured at each end by special fittings which are clamped into place during assembly of the frame, and which cannot be removed before the frame is dismantled. This prevents unauthorised removal of any safety rails. A simple failsafe fitting has the rail hung over hooks, which are clamped between parallel upright poles (2a, 8b) of the frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 1/26; E04G 1/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 1/15 (2006.01); E04G 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 5/14 (2013.01); E04G 1/154 (2013.01); E04G 5/147 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20004389 U1 20000817; EP 1134331 A2 20010919; EP 1134331 A3 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-19 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080208

2007-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071011

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04G 1/26 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04G 1/15 B

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI