Global Patent Index - EP 1134389 A3

EP 1134389 A3 2003-06-25 - Method for avoiding an inadvertent start of an internal-combustion engine

Title (en)

Method for avoiding an inadvertent start of an internal-combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Vermeiden eines ungewollten Starts einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode de prévention du démarrage involontaire d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1134389 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01101386 A

Priority

DE 10003634 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1134389A2] The method involves detecting the revolution rate of the engine; checking whether it lies within a suitable range for starting; checking whether a change in revolution rate is caused by activating an electric starter and enabling fuel injection if these conditions are fulfilled. Starter activation is detected by evaluating the battery voltage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/12; F02D 41/04; F02D 41/06; F02D 41/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/12 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/123 (2013.01); F02D 41/04 (2013.01); F02D 41/221 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1134389 A2 20010919; EP 1134389 A3 20030625; EP 1134389 B1 20040630

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-04-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50102702 P 20040805

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030916

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/12 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/04 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/22 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/06 B

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI