Global Patent Index - EP 1134426 A3

EP 1134426 A3 2002-09-04 - Centrifugal pump rotor

Title (en)

Centrifugal pump rotor

Title (de)

Kreiselpumplaufrad

Title (fr)

Rotor pour pompe centrifuge

Publication

EP 1134426 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01105141 A

Priority

DE 10012181 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1134426A2] The pump (10) has an impeller (40), which is fixed to a drive shaft (30) in a casing (20). A disc (44) arranged concentric to the shaft has radial blades (46), which form flow channels for the fluid to be pumped with the inner wall (22a) of the casing. The radial edges of three blades have at least one bump (48), which contacts the inner wall of the casing. Preferably, the bumps are formed in one piece with the blades.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/22 (2006.01); F04D 29/24 (2006.01); F04D 29/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/24 (2013.01); F04D 29/0473 (2013.01); F04D 29/2261 (2013.01); F04D 29/628 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1134426 A2 20010919; EP 1134426 A3 20020904; DE 10012181 A1 20010927; DE 10012181 C2 20020516; US 2001031202 A1 20011018; US 6551058 B2 20030422

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI