Global Patent Index - EP 1134428 A3

EP 1134428 A3 2003-06-04 - Valve arrangement

Title (en)

Valve arrangement

Title (de)

Ventilanordnung

Title (fr)

Agencement de distributeur

Publication

EP 1134428 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01105123 A

Priority

DE 10013192 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2001022191A1] A valve arrangement having an integral rail-like valve carrier body fitted with a plurality of valve units placed in a row or in-line. Each valve unit comprises a valve and at least one valve drive, the latter making electrical contact by way of plug contact means with electrical connection means. Each valve is provided with its own connection module having the associated electrical connection means, all connection modules being placed in a row free of mutual electrical control connection in sequence. Electrical conductors extend from each connection module and are in the form of flexible wire conductors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0832 (2013.01); F15B 13/0814 (2013.01); F15B 13/0853 (2013.01); F15B 13/0857 (2013.01); F15B 13/0867 (2013.01); F15B 13/0875 (2013.01); Y10T 137/5283 (2015.04); Y10T 137/87885 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1134428 A2 20010919; EP 1134428 A3 20030604; EP 1134428 B1 20041201; DE 10013192 A1 20010927; DE 10013192 B4 20040506; US 2001022191 A1 20010920; US 6427723 B2 20020806

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170302

2017-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170302

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170203

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160302

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140326

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-12-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104646 P 20050105

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030812

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI