Global Patent Index - EP 1134466 A3

EP 1134466 A3 2003-06-04 - Lip type seal

Title (en)

Lip type seal

Title (de)

Lippenabdichtung

Title (fr)

Joint à lèvres

Publication

EP 1134466 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01106546 A

Priority

JP 2000075275 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1134466A2] In a lip type seal, a case (31) is tightly fitted and fixed to an inner circumferential surface of a housing (1) through gasket means (32e). A resin lip member (33) constituted by an inner circumferential part (33c) extending in a bent state from a diameter direction part (33a) and its inner circumference to a sealed space (S2) side and forming a seal surface between an outer circumferential part of a rotary shaft (2) and the resin lip member (33); a rear surface support plate (36) disposed to abut on a rear surface of the diameter direction part (33a) of the resin lip member; and a stopper (37b) with a rear surface supported to a support surface (13) of the housing (1) through a second resin lip member (34) and a second rear surface support plate (38) and the top end coming close to or coming into contact with a rear surface of the inner circumferential part of the rear surface support plate (36), are provided on the inner circumference of the housing (1). Therefore, deformation of the rear surface support plate (36) due to pressure acting on the front surface of the resin lip member (33) and the contact of the rear surface support plate (36) with the rotary shaft (2) with the deformation are prevented (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16J 15/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16J 15/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16J 15/3228 (2013.01); F16J 15/3216 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1134466 A2 20010919; EP 1134466 A3 20030604; EP 1134466 B1 20051012; DE 60113903 D1 20051117; DE 60113903 T2 20060706; JP 2001263500 A 20010926; JP 3875824 B2 20070131; US 2001033058 A1 20011025; US 6565096 B2 20030520

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170307

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100315

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60113903 P 20051117

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040629

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EAGLE INDUSTRY CO., LTD.

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI